Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/03/2021 at 16:44:33 (UTC).

Deborah White vs. American Quality Home Services - John Moorman

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Deborah White filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against American Quality Home Services - John Moorman. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

White, Deborah K

Mckinney, TX 75069

Defendant

American Quality Home Services - John Moorman

11031 Millvale Ct

Frisco, TX 75035

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Release of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketRelease of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketRelease of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketRelease of Judgment Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketTrial Before The Court for JP's; Time: 10:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketZoom Hearing; Comments: Link sent to all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMotion Denied; Comments: Plts request for Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:; Comments: Collin County Constable Pct 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNo Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $126.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($126.00); Payor: White, Deborah K; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-000086-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $126.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less