This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 05/22/2020 at 00:07:18 (UTC).

De'Ambra Torres vs. Steven Foo Khuen Woon

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 De'Ambra Torres filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Steven Foo Khuen Woon. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0302

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Torres, De'Ambra La'Kye

Plano, TX 75074

Defendant

Woon, Steven Foo Khuen

Allen, TX 75013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Hershel R, Chapin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Counter Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Summary Judgment Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketMotion for Continuance Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Comments: by Plaintiff through e-mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketBench Note; Comments: Plaintiff/Counter Defendant did not appear.She called at 9:40am and said her Uber was running late and I gave her until 10:30 when her court date was at 10am.She sent in a request for continuance after 10:30am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketExhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Counter Plaintiff; Comments: for court costs only $500.00 appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketSummary Judgment Granted; Comments: For Defendant on original case-$500.00 appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Counter Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: PS $75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation; Comments: PCT3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $46.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Counter-Defendant, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($126.00); Payor: Torres, De'Ambra La'Kye; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-05710-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Counter-Defendant, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Counter-Defendant, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less