Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 05/28/2019 at 16:12:33 (UTC).

Creekwood Frisco Gaylord LLC Origin At Frisco Bridges vs. Angel Helle

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Creekwood Frisco Gaylord LLC Origin At Frisco Bridges filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Angel Helle. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0753

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Creekwood Frisco Gaylord LLC Origin At Frisco Bridges

2949 Parkwood Blvd

Frisco, TX 75034

Defendant

Helle, Angel

Frisco, TX 75034

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Eviction Hearing; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Order to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Motion for Dismissal; Comments: EMAILED/FAXED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Rule 510.4c Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Request Rule 510.4c

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Eviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Eviction Citation; Comments: SENT TO CONST PCT 4 THRU QUEUE - JB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Creekwood Frisco Gaylord LLC Origin At Frisco Bridges; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03261-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $121.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Civil Papers-: Person to Serve: Helle, Angel Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Precinct 4; Paper No: C4-19-002086; Location: PCT 4 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Creekwood Frisco Gaylord LLC Origin At Frisco Bridges is a litigant