This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 05/08/2019 at 16:16:00 (UTC).

Creekside Village Apts vs. LaQuintis Rose

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Creekside Village Apts filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LaQuintis Rose. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0273

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Creekside Village Apts

3400 W Park Blvd

Plano, TX 75075

Defendant

Rose, LaQuintis

Plano, TX 75075

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • Eviction Hearing; Time: 9:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Eviction - Dismissed per Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Mailed Signed Judgment to Both Sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Eviction Citation Returned to Court NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Eviction Plaintiff's Request to Dismiss by Fax

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Eviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Receipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Creekside Village Apts; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001394-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Eviction - Dismissed per Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $121.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Civil Papers-: Person to Serve: Rose, LaQuintis Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Precinct 3-2; Paper No: C3-19-003436; Location: PCT 3 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Creekside Village Apts is a litigant