This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 05/28/2020 at 14:16:42 (UTC).

Creekside Village Apts vs. Karliss Hilliard

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Creekside Village Apts filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Karliss Hilliard. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0271

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Creekside Village Apts

3400 W Park Blvd

Plano, TX 75075

Defendant

Hilliard, Karliss

Plano, TX 75075

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketEviction Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($185.00); Payor: Creekside Village Apts; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001773-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $185.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Filed with The Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Eviction Default - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketMailed Signed Judgment to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketEviction Default - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Returned to Court Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $121.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Creekside Village Apts; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001392-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Creekside Village Apts is a litigant