This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 08/11/2020 at 00:35:15 (UTC).

Conn Appliances Inc. vs. Paulette Hakizimana

Case Summary

On 03/07/2019 Conn Appliances Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Paulette Hakizimana. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0470

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances Inc.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Defendant

Hakizimana, Paulette

Prosper, TX 75078

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erin A Spencer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: To both parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Order to be Forthcoming

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketDWOP Hearing; Comments: JULY 12, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketReturn of Service Filed; Comments: served 4.16.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketAlternative Service Granted; Comments: emailed to mjscourts@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketRequest Rule 501.2e

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Citation - Private Process Server; Comments: EMAILED TO:mjscourts@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: Conn Appliances Inc.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-01922-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $46.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less