This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/01/2021 at 17:07:52 (UTC).

Conn Appliances Inc. vs. Jose Carrasco

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 Conn Appliances Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jose Carrasco. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0757

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances Inc.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Carrasco, Jose

Lavon, TX 75166

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Courtney Shackelford

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Dismissed Without Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDismissed Without Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit; Comments: Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit; Comments: Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit; Comments: Cover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMotion Denied; Comments: Motion denied- Debt may not be owned by the Plft.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketEmail; Comments: Emailed Att. No Answer on file

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Conn Appliances Inc.; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-01993-JP2; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketEmail; Comments: citation and petition sent to process server per filer request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conn Appliances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Courtney Shackelford