This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 11/12/2020 at 13:30:11 (UTC).

COLLIN CO/CCCCD/MCKINNEY I.S.D. Vs. MARK BROOKS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/19/2005 COLLIN CO/CCCCD/MCKINNEY I S D filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MARK BROOKS. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Oldner, Chris. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8205

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Oldner, Chris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

McKinney, I.s.d.

1919 S Shiloh Rd, #310, Lb 40

Garland, TX 75042

Collin County

Garland, TX 75042

Collin County Ccd

Garland, TX 75042

Defendants

Brooks, Brooke

Dallas, TX 75228

Heritage, Land Bank

Brooks, Mark

Dallas, TX 75228

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sydna H Gordon

Defendant Attorney

J. Scott Miller

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2005
  • DocketConversion; Comments: DOCKET SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • DocketConversion; Comments: ORDER TO DISMISSSGND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2005
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $289.00, Payments: $289.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($50.00); Payor: Auto Generated Conversion Entr; Receipt: Receipt # DCVAGG212530; Description: Escrow from Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2005
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $289.00, Payments: $289.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($239.00); Payor: Auto Generated Conversion Entr; Receipt: Receipt # DCVAGG212529; Description: Escrow from Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2005
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2005
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MONEY PAID 3 TAX CIT CERT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2005
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MONEY PAID FOR TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2005
  • DocketConversion; Comments: ORIG ANSW/HERITAGE LAND BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2005
  • DocketConversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2005
  • DocketConversion; Comments: GRN CRD RET MARK BROOKS 6/2/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2005
  • DocketConversion; Comments: GRN CARD RT/BROOKE BROOKS/6-3-05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • DocketConversion; Comments: T. JACKSON/5-20-05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • DocketConversion; Comments: GRN CARD RT/HERITAGE LAND BANK BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2005
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $289.00, Payments: $289.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $50.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2005
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $289.00, Payments: $289.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $239.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2005
  • DocketConversion; Comments: ISSD 3 CITS CERT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2005
  • DocketConversion; Comments: REQ ISSUANCE 3 CITS/CERT/MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2005
  • DocketConversion; Comments: TAX SUITS/NO MONEY RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heritage Land Bank, FLCA is a litigant

Latest cases where McKinney ISD is a litigant