This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 08/11/2020 at 00:49:38 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. vs. SHANNON CHEESBRO

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHANNON CHEESBRO. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0220

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Po Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452

Defendant

CHEESBRO, SHANNON K

Wylie, TX 75098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Default Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: Changed hearing type to a default hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: For hearing 072219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: 04/03/19 Returned to court04/11/19 Answer dateService fee $75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $3,316.87;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment; Comments: Efiled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation; Comments: Emailed to PCP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: CITIBANK, N.A.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-00921-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION WITH ATTACHMENT[S]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less