Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 21:22:21 (UTC).

Cheddrick McKee vs. Jessica Harrison

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 Cheddrick McKee filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Jessica Harrison. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Willis, Jill and Willis, Jill Renfro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Willis, Jill

Willis, Jill Renfro

 

Party Details

Respondent

Harrison, Jessica

Mckinney, TX 75071

Applicant

McKee, Cheddrick

Sherman, TX 75092

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Holly Joy Draper

Applicant Attorney

Rex R. McCarley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:25 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketGeneral Docket Entry; Comments: Parties appeared with counsel and witnesses; WSTH; final trial on Protective Order; Court grants Respondent's motion for directed verdict; Protective Order denied; OTBFC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProtective Order Hearing; Time: 1:00 PM; Comments: **1:00 p.m.**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDesignation of; Comments: Designation of Expert Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketOrder for Continuance; Comments: Agreed Order Granting Motion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Agreement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent's Answer to Application for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketOrder; Comments: Order Vacating Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Respondent, Charges: $497.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$497.00; Transactions: Amount: $175.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Respondent, Charges: $497.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$497.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketIssued Protective Order (Court Activity)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketConstable Service Fee #1,$175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Ex Parte Protective Order $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketTemporary Ex Parte Protective Order; Comments: Amended Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAmended; Comments: Amended Application for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Respondent, Charges: $497.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$497.00; Transactions: Amount: $314.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketApp for Protective Ord (OCA) $319.00; Comments: Application for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less