This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 09/01/2019 at 16:13:42 (UTC).

Champion Management Group, LLC vs. ShiftKey, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Champion Management Group, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ShiftKey, LLC. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0300

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Champion Management Group, LLC

Mary Harokopus, Pllc, 6401 Eldorado Parkway, Ste. 108

Mckinney, TX 75070

Defendant

ShiftKey, LLC

By Serving Ra Legallnc Corp Services, Inc, 10601 Clarence Dr, Ste 250

Frisco, TX 75033

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary L Harokopus

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • Order Granted; Comments: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Motion for Non-Suit; Comments: Motion for Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Citation Served; Comments: PS $75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Exhibit; Comments: ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Civil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Civil Citation; Comments: PCT4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Receipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • No Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Small Claims Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($75.00); Payor: Champion Management Group, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-05722-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Champion Management Group, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-05575-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Attorney Costs; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less