This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 04/05/2023 at 19:33:41 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Joel Griffin

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Joel Griffin. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Venegoni, Vincent J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0169

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Venegoni, Vincent J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

Defendant

Griffin, Joel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jamila B Lloyd

Defendant Attorney

David Shuster

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketMotion Granted -; Comments: for Discovery//emailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketMotion for Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketReturn of Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $54.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed by Attorney; Comments: David Shuster

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDebt Claim Citation - Private Process Server; Comments: txefile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $54.00, Payments: $54.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($21.00); Description: State Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $54.00, Payments: $54.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($33.00); Payor: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Receipt: Receipt # 2023-00740-JP4; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $54.00, Payments: $54.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $54.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less