This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 11/15/2020 at 02:31:37 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. DAESHA BYRD

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAESHA BYRD. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0135

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

P.O. Box 65020

Lubbock, TX 79464

Defendant

BYRD, DAESHA R

Plano, TX 75074-3131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketMail Returned to Court - Moved or Bad Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCourt Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Comments: nunc pro tunc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMailed Signed Judgment to Both Sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketFailed to Appear Certificate Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketJudge's Docket Entry; Comments: Default judgment for Plaintiff, $6989.73 plus court costs and post judgment interest of 5%, provided prepared order and signed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketProve Up; Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Reset to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Comments: PROPOSED FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued to Private Process Server; Comments: via email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001416-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss