This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/25/2022 at 15:29:34 (UTC).

BT-JV MS, L.L.C. vs. Leon Johnson

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 BT-JV MS, L L C filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Leon Johnson. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0291

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BT-JV MS, L.L.C.

6600 Mckinney Ranch Pkwy, Attn: Leasing Office

Mckinney, TX 75070

Defendant

Johnson, Leon

Mckinney, TX 75070

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 1:30 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Dismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketE-Mailed Hearing Notice to Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Possession of Property; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $129.00, Payments: $129.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($21.00); Description: State Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $129.00, Payments: $129.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($108.00); Payor: BT-JV MS, L.L.C.; Receipt: Receipt # 2022-001160-JP1; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $129.00, Payments: $129.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $129.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: March 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Papers-: Person to Serve: Johnson, Leon Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Precinct 1; Paper No: C1-22-001014; Location: PCT 1 Constable

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BT-JV MS LLC is a litigant