Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/07/2021 at 15:16:00 (UTC).

BG Personnel, L.P. VS. Adams Run Holding Company, LLC, d/b/a Tacony Crossing By One Wall Apartments and One Wall Management, LLC d/b/a Tacony Crossing by One Wall Apartments

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 BG Personnel, L P filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Adams Run Holding Company, LLC, d/b/a Tacony Crossing By One Wall Apartments and One Wall Management, LLC d/b/a Tacony Crossing by One Wall Apartments. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Bender, Jay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Bender, Jay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BG Personnel, L.P.

3710 Rawlins Street, Suite 1300

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendants

Adams Run Holding Company, LLC

Registered Agent, Samuel Goldstein, 25B Windsor Circle

Newark, DE 19702

One Wall Management, LLC

Registered Agent, Ron Kutas, 24 Commerce St., 12Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig A Bernstein

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketE-Served through E-Filing Portal; Comments: Env. #51932772 Amended Petition, Adams Run Holding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCitation; Comments: Amended Petition to Adams Run Holding Company, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $319.00, Payments: $319.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($4.00); Payor: BG Personnel, L.P.; Receipt: Receipt # CC-CV-01677-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $319.00, Payments: $319.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $4.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketClerk Notes; Comments: style of case did not change- Adams - new address added

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Citation Pre Judgment - $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: Plaintiff's First Amended Origina Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $319.00, Payments: $319.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $0.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $319.00, Payments: $319.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($315.00); Payor: BG Personnel, L.P.; Receipt: Receipt # CC-CV-01531-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $319.00, Payments: $319.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $315.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketE-Served through E-Filing Portal; Comments: Env. #51594632

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCitation; Comments: to One Wall Management

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketE-Served through E-Filing Portal; Comments: Env. #51594632

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCitation; Comments: to Adams Run Holdings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Citation Pre Judgment - $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Citation Pre Judgment - $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketPetition for Contract Consumer/Commer/Debt (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BG Personnel, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig A. Bernstein