This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 09/24/2019 at 17:04:45 (UTC).

Bernardaud NA Inc. vs. MEBO MBS1, LLC d/b/a Edith's French Cafe

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 Bernardaud NA Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MEBO MBS1, LLC d/b/a Edith's French Cafe. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0155

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bernardaud NA Inc.

C/O Law Offices Of Sam Emerick, Attorney, 18208 Preston Rd, Ste D9-270

Dallas, TX 75252

Defendant

MEBO MBS1, LLC d/b/a Edith's French Cafe

5729 Lebannon Rd

Frisco, TX 75034

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sam Emerick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • Prove-up Hearing; Time: 9:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Motion for Non-Suit; Comments: Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Summons Issued; Comments: P/U:11/19/19 @ 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Return of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Alternative Service Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Motion Filed:; Comments: FOR SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Civil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Small Claims Petition; Comments: Small Claims Petition ($51.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Bernardaud NA Inc.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-05335-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $51.00;

    Read MoreRead Less