This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 08/19/2020 at 00:53:24 (UTC).

Barclays Bank Delaware vs. Guelmarys Ortiz

Case Summary

On 08/21/2019 Barclays Bank Delaware filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Guelmarys Ortiz. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1647

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barclays Bank Delaware

Scott & Associates, P.C., P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Ortiz, Guelmarys L

Dallas, TX 75287

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Comments: Mailed to both parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketReturn of Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketAlternative Service Granted; Comments: holding for abc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketRequest Rule 501.2e

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Citation - Private Process Server; Comments: emailed 8/26/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Barclays Bank Delaware; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-06507-JP4; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $51.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barclays Bank Delaware is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper