This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 04/04/2019 at 18:47:16 (UTC).

Bank of America N.A. vs. Chanelle Lesure

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 Bank of America N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Chanelle Lesure. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0440

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America N.A.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Lesure, Chanelle M.

Frisco, TX 75035

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erin A Spencer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • Dismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Order to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Motion for Non-Suit; Comments: Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DWOP Hearing; Comments: MAY 10TH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Citation Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Civil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Debt Claim Citation - Private Process Server; Comments: emailed to mjscourts@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Debt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: Bank of America N.A.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-01756-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $46.00;

    Read MoreRead Less