Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/04/2020 at 14:12:47 (UTC).

Archer Family Trust vs. Jacquelyn Robinson,Matthew Robinson

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 Archer Family Trust filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jacquelyn Robinson,Matthew Robinson. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1155

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Archer Family Trust

4211 S. Preston Rd. Suite #101, Suite # 101

Celina, TX 75009

Defendants

Robinson, Matthew

Plano, TX 75074

Robinson, Jacquelyn

Plano, TX 75074

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketMail Returned; Comments: from defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss - Partial Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Comments: APPEAL BOND - $1200

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketExhibit; Comments: from defendant in court for Judge to view

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketExhibit; Comments: from plaintiffin courtfor Judge to view

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketRule 510.4c Served; Comments: Matthew Robinson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketRule 510.4c Served; Comments: Jacquelyn Robinson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $196.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($196.00); Payor: Archer Family Trust; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03558-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $196.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less