This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 12/06/2021 at 15:05:54 (UTC).

Anna Independent School District vs. David Lee Taylor

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 Anna Independent School District filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against David Lee Taylor. This case was filed in Collin County District Courthouse, Collin County District Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Flint, George B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Flint, George B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anna Independent School District

Perdue,Brandon,Fielder,Collins & Mott,Llp, 500 East Border St.,Suite 640

Arlington, TX 76010

City Of Anna

Arlington, TX 76010

Defendants

Capital One NA

Corporation Service Co.Dba Csc-Lawyers Inc. Service Co., 211 E.7Th Street,Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Citibank, N.A.

7700 East Arapahoe Road, Suite 220

Centennial, CO 80112

Independent Bank

Serving Branch Manager Or President, 7777 Henneman Way

Mckinney, TX 75070

Phi Financial Services, Inc.

Reg.Agent, Ct Corporation System, 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.

Reg.Agent,Ct Corporation System, 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Taylor, Alina Marie

Allen, TX 75002

Taylor, David Lee

Anna, TX 75409-2548

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elena N Fernandez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketConstable Service Return; Comments: Alina Marie Taylor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $503.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$503.00; Transactions: Amount: $281.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketConstable Service Fee #3, $75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketConstable Service Fee #1, $75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Papers-: Person to Serve: Taylor, David Type: TAX CITATION; Origin: 401st District Court, Collin County, Texas; Paper No: C1-21-004017; Location: PCT 1 Constable

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Papers-: Person to Serve: Taylor, Alina Type: TAX CITATION; Origin: 401st District Court; Paper No: C3-21-006921; Location: PCT 3 Constable

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Papers-: Person to Serve: Independent Bank, Type: TAX CITATION; Origin: 401st District Court, Collin County, Texas; Paper No: C1-21-004019; Location: PCT 1 Constable

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $503.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$503.00; Transactions: Amount: $222.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketTax Original Petition - OCA $222.00; Comments: Plaintiffs' Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHI FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Anna Independent School District is a litigant

Latest cases where INDEPENDENT BANK is a litigant