This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 03/17/2021 at 21:38:37 (UTC).

Angel Selix vs. Kayla Young, and Christopher Casten, Jr.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Angel Selix filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kayla Young, and Christopher Casten, Jr. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Willis, Jill, Rusch, Mark and Flint, George B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Willis, Jill

Rusch, Mark

Flint, George B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Selix, Angel

Dallas, TX 75251

Defendants

Young, Kayla

Princeton, TX 75407

Casten, Christopher, Jr.

814 Maples Avenue B

Mckinney, TX 75069

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard A Stucky

Defendant Attorney

Staci H Collins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery; Comments: Defendant's Certificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($40.00); Payor: Young, Kayla; Receipt: Receipt # DC-26502-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $40.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketJury Fee Paid $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery; Comments: Defendant's Certificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDefendant's; Comments: Defendant's Request for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant Kayla Young's Original Answer, Rule 193.7 Notice and Jury Demand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Kayla Young - Citation - Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketOrder for Substituted Service; Comments: Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Substitute Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service; Comments: Plaintiff's Motion for Rule 106 Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Notice of Administrative Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketAdministrative Order; Comments: Order signed 8/31/2020 to transfer to 401st.Order scanned into minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($324.00); Payor: Selix, Angel; Receipt: Receipt # DC-17473-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $324.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase Information Sheet; Comments: Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition, Jury Demand, Request for Written Discovery and Rule 193.7 Notice

    Read MoreRead Less