This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 03/12/2021 at 16:35:13 (UTC).

Anderson Merchandisers, LLC vs. Fabrique Innovations, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Anderson Merchandisers, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Fabrique Innovations, Inc. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Roach, John R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Roach, John R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anderson Merchandisers, LLC

Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta Pc, 2500 N Dallas Parkway, Suite 600

Plano, TX 75093-4820

Defendant

Fabrique Innovations, Inc.

39 W. 37Th Street

New York, NY 10018

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carlisle A. Braun

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMailed; Comments: judgment letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketService Member & Sailor's Affidavit; Comments: Plaintiff's Servicemembers' Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Citation - Secretary of the State of Texas to be served upon: Fabrique Innovations, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Notice of Administrative Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAdministrative Order; Comments: Order signed 10/30/2020 to transfer to the 296th Court.Order scanned into minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $320.00, Payments: $320.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($320.00); Payor: Anderson Merchandisers, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # DC-23513-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $320.00, Payments: $320.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $320.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation to Secretary Of State $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fabrique Innovations, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Anderson Merchandisers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlisle A. Braun