This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 06/24/2020 at 00:38:37 (UTC).

Amerisource Companies, L.P. vs. DG Packaging, LLC d/b/a Blue Jay Bottling,Cedrs, LLC d/b/a VitaNourish

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 Amerisource Companies, L P filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DG Packaging, LLC d/b/a Blue Jay Bottling,Cedrs, LLC d/b/a VitaNourish. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0154

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amerisource Companies, L.P.

Albin Roach, Pllc, 5665 Dallas Parkway, Suite 200

Frisco, TX 75034

Defendants

Cedrs, LLC d/b/a VitaNourish

10624 A Eastern A287

Henderson, NV 89052

DG Packaging, LLC d/b/a Blue Jay Bottling

4240 International Pkwy - Ste# 140

Carrollton, TX 75007

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baleigh W Cherry

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Request; Comments: Letter requestiing citation for Cedrs, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service Filed; Comments: Affidavit of Service// Cert of Service from SOS (DG Packaging, LLC d/b/a Blue Jay Bottling)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketDWOP Hearing; Comments: March 27, 2020 // parties do not need to appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Request; Comments: Letter Requesting Issuance of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketDWOP Hearing; Comments: NOVEMBER 8, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCitation Returned Unserved; Comments: from S.O.S to DG Pkgn, LLC dba Blue Jay Bottling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketCitation Returned Unserved; Comments: Affidavit of Due Diligence for Reg Agent Cecilia D Cates - DG Packaging, LLC d/b/a Blue Jay Bottling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketReturn of Service Filed; Comments: Affidavit of Service to S.O.S ONLY (Cedrs, LLC d/b/a VitaNourish)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Amerisource Companies, L.P.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-05334-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $51.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less