This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 07/04/2020 at 04:23:12 (UTC).

Amerisource Companies, L.P. vs. Cloud Control, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 Amerisource Companies, L P filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Cloud Control, Inc. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0153

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amerisource Companies, L.P.

Albin Roach, Pllc, 5665 Dallas Parkway, Suite 200

Frisco, TX 75034

Defendant

Cloud Control, Inc.

1849 Cochran Pl

Los Angeles, CA 90019

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baleigh W Cherry

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketDWOP Hearing; Comments: 8/21/20 // NO APPEAR REQ'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCitation Returned Unserved; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Request; Comments: Letter Requesting Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCitation Returned Unserved; Comments: FOR CLOUD CONTROL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketDWOP Hearing; Comments: March 27, 2020 // parties do not need to appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketDWOP Hearing; Comments: NOVEMBER 8, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCitation Returned Unserved; Comments: from S.O.S to Cloud Control Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketReturn of Service Filed; Comments: FOR S.O.S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Amerisource Companies, L.P.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-05301-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $51.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less