This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 09/28/2020 at 03:54:00 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs. Timothy Bussell

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Timothy Bussell. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Tucker, Angela and Bouressa, Andrea. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Tucker, Angela

Bouressa, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

The Degrasse Law Firm, Pc, 1800 Bering Drive, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant

Bussell, Timothy

Richardson, TX 75082

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald D DeGrasse

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Migliaccio

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Judgment Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketAgreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement; Comments: Rule 11 Settlement Agreement to Pay Out Debt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Notice of Filing of Plaintiff's Affidavit and/or Other Trial Related Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketAdministrative Order; Comments: Order signed 9/30/2019 to transfer to the 471st.Order scanned into minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Answer Filed; Comments: No further resets

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketReturned Mail Undeliverable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Citation - Timothy Bussell

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $314.00, Payments: $314.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Civil Process Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Citation - Timothy Bussell - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $314.00, Payments: $314.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: American Express National Bank; Receipt: Receipt # DC-07625-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $314.00, Payments: $314.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less