This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 12/04/2019 at 15:41:34 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs. Sherrad L. Patterson

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sherrad L Patterson. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Willis, Jill. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Willis, Jill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

The Degrasse Law Firm, Pc, 1800 Bering Drive, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant

Patterson, Sherrad L.

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald D DeGrasse

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:25 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Copy of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Request for Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $303.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Request for Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $314.00, Payments: $314.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($8.00); Payor: American Express National Bank; Receipt: Receipt # DC-04601-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $314.00, Payments: $314.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $314.00, Payments: $314.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: American Express National Bank; Receipt: Receipt # DC-00996-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $314.00, Payments: $314.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less