This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 09/01/2020 at 00:57:16 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs. Eric F. Kelly

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Eric F Kelly. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Thompson, Andrea. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Thompson, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

The Degrasse Law Firm, Pc, 1800 Bering Drive, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant

Kelly, Eric F.

Frisco, TX 75035

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald D DeGrasse

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $394.00, Payments: $394.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($80.00); Payor: American Express National Bank; Receipt: Receipt # DC-21831-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $394.00, Payments: $394.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $80.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketMotion to Reinstate - Civil$80.00; Comments: Verified Motion to Set Aside Dismissal and Reinstate Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $394.00, Payments: $394.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($8.00); Payor: American Express National Bank; Receipt: Receipt # DC-21111-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $394.00, Payments: $394.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: DWOP mailed to parties by Court Coordinator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMotion; Comments: Motion to Retain Case on Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Return of Non Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $394.00, Payments: $394.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: American Express National Bank; Receipt: Receipt # DC-07551-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $394.00, Payments: $394.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less