This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 06/17/2020 at 01:08:43 (UTC).

American Express National Bank, Plaintiff vs. Laura Morris d/b/a Trinity, Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/18/2019 American Express National Bank, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Laura Morris d/b/a Trinity, Defendant. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Willis, Jill. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Willis, Jill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

The Degrasse Law Firm, Pc, 1800 Bering Drive, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant

Morris, Laura

Fairview, TX 75069

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald D DeGrasse

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketReturned Mail Undeliverable; Comments: Laura Morris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketDWOP Docket; Comments: "Case called, no answer. DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:25 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDWOP Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDWOP Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDWOP Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketOrder to Reinstate REOPEN - OCA; Comments: Order to Set Aside Dismissal and Reinstate Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $394.00, Payments: $394.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($80.00); Payor: American Express Bank, FSB; Receipt: Receipt # DC-19101-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $394.00, Payments: $394.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($8.00); Payor: American Express Bank, FSB; Receipt: Receipt # DC-14636-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $394.00, Payments: $394.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Return of Non Service - Citation - Laura Morris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $394.00, Payments: $394.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: American Express Bank, FSB; Receipt: Receipt # DC-04554-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $394.00, Payments: $394.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less