This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 03/18/2021 at 09:14:25 (UTC).

Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, A/S/O Isaac Tetteh, Plaintiff, vs. Sanliv Industries Co., Ltd. (A/K/A Sanliv; A/K/A Sanliv Sanitary Wares). Defendant.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, A/S/O Isaac Tetteh, Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Sanliv Industries Co , Ltd A/K/A Sanliv A/K/A Sanliv Sanitary Wares Defendant. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgeworth, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Edgeworth, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company

Law Offices Of Paul Vigushin, P.C., 2201 N. Central Expy., Ste. 115

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

Sanliv Industries Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Vigushin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Officer's Return - Sanliv Industries co., LTD via Secretary of State - Citation First Amended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $348.00, Payments: $348.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($20.00); Payor: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company; Receipt: Receipt # DC-27934-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $348.00, Payments: $348.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $20.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation to Secretary Of State $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Sent by Court; Comments: Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 04/30/2021 @ 8:30am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Sent by Court; Comments: Scheduling Conference 11/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketOut of County Service Fee; Comments: Service Return-Secretary of State

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $348.00, Payments: $348.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($328.00); Payor: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company; Receipt: Receipt # DC-17607-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $348.00, Payments: $348.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $328.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation to Secretary Of State $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Vigushin