Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/29/2020 at 00:28:21 (UTC).

Advenir at Addison, LLC, dba Advenir on Addison vs. Maria Fudala

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 Advenir at Addison, LLC, dba Advenir on Addison filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Maria Fudala. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1175

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Advenir at Addison, LLC, dba Advenir on Addison

6300 La Calma Dr , Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendant

Fudala, Maria

Dallas, TX 75287

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($185.00); Payor: Nationwide Eviction; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-04598-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $185.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketWrit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Comments: APPEAL BOND - $2825

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketRule 510.4c Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $121.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Nationwide Eviction; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03725-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less