This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 02/04/2021 at 14:44:43 (UTC).

Advenir at Addison, LLC, dba Advenir on Addison vs. Jacob Sharper

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Advenir at Addison, LLC, dba Advenir on Addison filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jacob Sharper. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0958

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Advenir at Addison, LLC, dba Advenir on Addison

6300 La Calma Dr , Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendant

Sharper, Jacob

Dallas, TX 75287

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Release of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketRelease of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketRelease of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Comments: APPEAL BOND - $2253

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: Jacob Sharper by serving Adult B/F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $121.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Nationwide Eviction; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02975-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less