Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 06/15/2021 at 08:06:42 (UTC).

Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC vs. Teresa Durham

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Teresa Durham. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Baxter, Lance. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Baxter, Lance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC

Scott & Associates, P.C., P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Defendant

Durham, Teresa

Allen, TX 75013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Garza

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketPrivate Process Server; Comments: $84.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketE-Served through E-Filing Portal; Comments: 52581239

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $311.00, Payments: $311.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($311.00); Payor: Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # CC-CV-02197-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $311.00, Payments: $311.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $311.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Citation Pre Judgment - $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketRequest; Comments: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPetition for Contract Consumer/Commer/Debt (OCA); Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Garza