This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 08/27/2020 at 10:24:07 (UTC).

Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc vs. Peter Muturi

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Peter Muturi. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0685

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Muturi, Peter

Dallas, TX 75252

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex Anshul

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketBench Note; Comments: def no show

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketMediation Hearing; Time: 8:30 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketMediation Notice Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketTo be set for Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Comments: by Defendant by e-mail with answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Motion Hearing; Time: 10:30 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketAlternative Service Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketRequest Rule 501.2e

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $3,378.36;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketNo Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03057-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Anshul