This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/29/2020 at 02:32:58 (UTC).

Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC vs. Mark Witt

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mark Witt. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0296

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Witt, Mark

Princeton, TX 75407

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex Anshul

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: Motion for Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: For hearing 072219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: 04/01/19 Returned to court04/13/19 Answer dateService fee $82.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $1,810.42;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation; Comments: Emailed to ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment; Comments: Efiled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-01187-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less