This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 08/18/2020 at 01:40:40 (UTC).

Abbey Mulder, Plaintiff, v. Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/07/2019 Abbey Mulder, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Tucker, Angela. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Tucker, Angela

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mulder, Abbey

Addison, TX 75001

Defendant

Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company

Law Offices Of Fanaff, Hoagland ,Gonzales &, Baldwin, Po Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grant Gerleman

Defendant Attorney

Clara M Toman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Agreement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketMailed or Faxed or Emailed Order; Comments: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketAgreed Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketMediation Action; Comments: Mediator's correspondence to Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($40.00); Payor: Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company; Receipt: Receipt # DC-09646-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $40.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketJury Fee Paid $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Citation- Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company by Delivering to Julie Huerta - Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Citation - Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company by Delivering to Julie Huerta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: Mulder, Abbey; Receipt: Receipt # DC-06389-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Requests for Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less