This case was last updated from Bexar County District Courts on 10/28/2022 at 18:52:43 (UTC).

Ziona Solis VS Zachry Construction Corporation ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Ziona Solis filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Zachry Construction Corporation. This case was filed in Bexar County District Courts, Bexar County Courthouse located in Bexar, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4235

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Bexar, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ziona Solis

Defendant

Zachry Construction Corporation

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • DispositionCases Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE NON SUIT; WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketANSWER/RESPONSE; DEFENDANT JUSTIN GLOVER AND ZACHRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION'S ORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCitation; #9414 8149 0226 3913 2358 06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Zachry Construction Corporation - Mailed out certified mail 12/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCitation; #9414 8149 0226 3913 2357 90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Justin Glover - Mailed out certified mail 12/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE AND PROCESS; Certified Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNew Cases Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less