This case was last updated from Bexar County District Courts on 05/30/2023 at 03:11:03 (UTC).

WILLIE PITTS VS CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/02/2023 WILLIE PITTS filed an Other lawsuit against CHARLES SCHWAB CO , INC. This case was filed in Bexar County District Courts, Bexar County Courthouse located in Bexar, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8784

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Bexar, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PITTS, WILLIE

Defendants

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

TD Ameritrade, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Canfield, Gregory W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketRULE 11 AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SUCCESSFUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SUCCESSFUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCitation Certified Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketPETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketNew Cases Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less