This case was last updated from Bexar County District Courts on 05/16/2023 at 17:20:05 (UTC).

Endurance American Insurance Company VS Jisun Lee ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/18/2023 Endurance American Insurance Company filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jisun Lee. This case was filed in Bexar County District Courts, Bexar County Courthouse located in Bexar, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7683

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Bexar, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Endurance American Insurance Company

Defendants

K-Air Corporation

Lee, Jisun

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARLAN, ALAN J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/08/2023

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SUCCESSFUL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023

DocketCitation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE AND PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketPETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketNew Cases Filed (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less