This case was last updated from Bexar County District Courts on 09/19/2023 at 18:18:49 (UTC).

Reep Equity, LLC. VS Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/21/2023 Reep Equity, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Bexar County District Courts, Bexar County Courthouse located in Bexar, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4606

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Bexar, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Reep Equity, LLC.

Wurzbach Advisors, LLC.

Defendant

Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOREE, ROBERT W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/11/2023

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE OF; C/R: ATEGRITY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketCitation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketLETTER TO DISTRICT CLERK; FR: JONATHAN KOGUT RE: SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE OF; ATEGRITY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

DocketCitation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketPETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketNew Cases Filed (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less