This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2018 at 08:00:27 (UTC).

Lanier v. Syncreon Holdings Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 Lanier filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Syncreon Holdings Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Victoria A. Roberts and Mark A. Randon. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:11-CV-14780

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victoria A. Roberts

Referral Judge

Mark A. Randon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Willie E. Lanier, Sr.

Defendants

John and Jane Does

Syncreon Holdings Ltd.

Brian Enright

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cynthia E. Kernick

Thomas M. Pohl - NOT SWORN

 

Court Documents

#20

#70

#128

 

Docket Entries

04/17/2014
View Court Documents

Docket(#128) ORDER denying 97 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Plaintiff's 99 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2013
View Court Documents

Docket(#70) ORDER: Denying 58 Motion to Strike; Denying without Prejudice 59 Motion to Compel; Mooting 60 Motion for Protective Order; and Other Discovery Issues. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (see image for details and dates) (LVer)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2012
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Dismiss And Granting Leave to Amend Count I. (see order for dates and details). Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less