This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2021 at 16:22:27 (UTC).

MARCHAND et al v. OWENS ILLINOIS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 MARCHAND filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against OWENS ILLINOIS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-60027

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARSENE MARCHAND

JANET MARCHAND

Defendants

RAYMARK INDUSTRIES, INC.

OWENS ILLINOIS, INC.

PITTSBURGH CORNING CORP

EAGLE-PICHER INDUSTRIES, INC.

SOUTHERN TEXTILE CORP.

H.K. PORTER CO., INC.

RAYBESTOS-MANHATTAN, INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY

KEENE CORP, THE

GAF CORP

CAREY CANADA, INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID J. MCMORRIS

PETER J. RUBIN

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

08/10/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' PETITION TO CORRECT A CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a) IS GRANTED AND THAT, AS TO THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST, 1. ANY VIABLE NON-BANKRUPT DEFENDANTS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 2. THE CASES ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE "BANKRUPTCY-ONLY" DOCKET; AND 3. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THESE CASES AS CLOSED FOR ADMINISTRATIVE PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/9/2017. 8/10/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (SEE DOC. NO. 9013 IN 01-MD-875) (aeg) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Docket entries filed in District of Massachusetts (Boston) (jmv, ) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL by CAREY CANADA, INC., EAGLE-PICHER INDUSTRIES, INC., GAF CORP, H.K. PORTER CO., INC., KEENE CORP, THE, ARSENE MARCHAND, JANET MARCHAND, OWENS ILLINOIS, INC., OWENS-ILLINOIS, OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY, PITTSBURGH CORNING CORP, RAYMARK INDUSTRIES, INC., SOUTHERN TEXTILE CORP. (jmv, ) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OULINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/10/17. 7/19/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(jmv, ) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER NO. 1251 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE USDC DISTRICT OF MASSACHUSETTS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 07/10/17. 07/19/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(jmv, ) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less