This case was last updated from PACER on 07/26/2020 at 09:01:04 (UTC).

Jabour v. Fifth Third Bancorp et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 Jabour filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Fifth Third Bancorp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellen S. Carmody. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-00391

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ellen S. Carmody

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kari Jabour

Defendants

Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada

Fifth Third Bancorp

Not Classified By Court

Facilitative Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Troy W. Haney

Attorney at Haney Law Office PC

330 E Fulton St.

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Defendant Attorneys

D. Andrew Portinga

Attorney at Miller Johnson PLC (Grand Rapids)

205 Monroe Ave. Nw, Ste. 800, P.O. Box 306

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0306

Byrne J. Decker

Attorney at Pierce Atwood LLP

254 Commercial St.

Portland, ME 04101

Brittany Dale Parling

Attorney at Jones Day

150 W Jefferson Ave., Ste. 2100

Detroit, MI 48226

Sara Pikofsky

Attorney at Jones Day (DC)

51 Louisiana Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20001-2113

Not Classified By Court Attorney

William W. Jack, Jr.

Attorney at Smith Haughey Rice & Roegge PC (Grand Rapids)

100 Monroe Center, Nw

Grand Rapids, MI 49503-2802

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) ORDER granting STIPULATION #30 of dismissal; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

#30

(#30) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal by plaintiff Kari Jabour (Haney, Troy) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

#29

(#29) ORDER granting #27 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers; dismissal papers due 3/12/2018; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

#28

(#28) PROPOSED ORDER regarding Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Portinga, D.) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#27

(#27) JOINT MOTION for extension of time to File Dismissal Papers by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada; (Portinga, D.) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#26

(#26) ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be submitted by 2/20/2018; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

#25

(#25) REPORT of facilitative mediation held 1/19/18; case is settled, closing documents to be filed by 30 days (Jack, William) Modified text on 1/22/2018 (ems). (Entered: 01/22/2018)

#24

(#24) ORDER granting STIPULATION #23 : The deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to 2/19/2018; the deadline for responses to dispositive motions is extended to 3/21/2018; the deadline for replies to responses to dispositive motions is extended to 4/4/2018; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#23

(#23) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Dispositive Motion Deadlines by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Portinga, D.) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

4 #1

Attachment copy of signed return receipt card

#4

(#4) SUMMONS returned executed; Fifth Third Bancorp served on 5/2/2017, answer due 5/23/2017 (Attachments: #1 Attachment copy of signed return receipt card) (Haney, Troy) (Entered: 05/08/2017)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Fifth Third Bancorp, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (ems) (Entered: 04/28/2017)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems) (Entered: 04/28/2017)

1 #4

Summons Sun Life

1 #3

Summons Fifth Third

1 #2

Continuation of Exhibit A

1 #1

Exhibit A - Copy of life insurance policy

#1

FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Kari Jabour in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-3832595 (Haney, Troy) (Entered: 04/28/2017)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER granting STIPULATION #30 of dismissal; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal by plaintiff Kari Jabour (Haney, Troy) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER granting #27 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers; dismissal papers due 3/12/2018; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) PROPOSED ORDER regarding Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Portinga, D.) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) JOINT MOTION for extension of time to File Dismissal Papers by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada; (Portinga, D.) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be submitted by 2/20/2018; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPORT of facilitative mediation held 1/19/18; case is settled, closing documents to be filed by 30 days (Jack, William) Modified text on 1/22/2018 (ems). (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting STIPULATION #23 : The deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to 2/19/2018; the deadline for responses to dispositive motions is extended to 3/21/2018; the deadline for replies to responses to dispositive motions is extended to 4/4/2018; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Dispositive Motion Deadlines by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Portinga, D.) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPORT of facilitative mediation held 10/25/17; mediation is completed; case is not settled, (Jack, William) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting STIPULATION #6 ; Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada shall have an extension to and including 6/22/2017, in which to file and serve its written response to Plaintiff's Complaint; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 05/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada identifying Corporate Parent Sun Life Financial Inc. for Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Portinga, D.) (Entered: 05/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Portinga, D.) (Entered: 05/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of D. Andrew Portinga on behalf of defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Portinga, D.) (Entered: 05/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada served on 5/2/2017, answer due 5/23/2017 (Attachments: #1 Attachment copy of signed return receipt card) (Haney, Troy) (Entered: 05/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS returned executed; Fifth Third Bancorp served on 5/2/2017, answer due 5/23/2017 (Attachments: #1 Attachment copy of signed return receipt card) (Haney, Troy) (Entered: 05/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Fifth Third Bancorp, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (ems) (Entered: 04/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems) (Entered: 04/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Kari Jabour in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-3832595 (Haney, Troy) (Entered: 04/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kari Jabour (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of life insurance policy, #2 Continuation of Exhibit A, #3 Summons Fifth Third, #4 Summons Sun Life) (Haney, Troy) Modified text on 4/28/2017 (ems). (Entered: 04/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less