This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2019 at 22:04:01 (UTC).

HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. v. SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2017 HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL H. SLOMSKY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-02703

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL H. SLOMSKY

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Claimants

HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC

WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC

WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF

DEBBIE CROOM

SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF

SAMANTHA FULLER

WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC

NANCY COOVER

BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC

PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC

NOLBERTO DABRIEL

MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC

LORI CAHILL

ANGELA GIL

HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC

O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC

SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC

BRANTON WALKER

MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC

82 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

JOSEPH M. VENTO

Attorney at PECKAR & ABRAMSON, P.C.

70 Grand Avenue

River Edge, NJ 07661

WILLIAM M. WHITMAN

Attorney at WHITMAN LLC

500 East Swedesford Rd, Suite 300

Wayne, PA 19087

SHANNON D. AZZARO

Attorney at PECKAR & ABRAMSON PC

70 Grand Avenue

River Edge, NJ 07661

KEVIN J. O'CONNOR

Attorney at PECKAR & ABRAMSON PC

70 Grand Ave

River Edge, NJ 07661

STEPHEN E. SKOVRON

1440 Carol Road

Philadelphia, PA 19046

Other Attorneys

ELIZABETH A. WARE

Attorney at STEVENS & LEE

111 N 6Th St, Pobox 67

Reading, PA 19603

JOSEPH E. WOLFSON

Attorney at STEVENS & LEE

1818 Market Street, 29Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#64

(#64) SCHEDULING ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 7/18/2019 AT 02:30 PM IN JUDGES CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/6/2019 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/28/2019. DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 5/23/2019. MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 7/5/2019. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 5/23/2019. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/20/2019. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/20/2019. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 7/25/2019 AT 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 13A BEFORE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/29/2018. 8/29/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#63

(#63) ORDER THAT THE #62 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF SHANNON D. AZZARO IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/10/2018.8/14/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APP FORWARDED.(kp, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

62 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#62

(#62) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Shannon D. Azzaro, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12978946.) filed by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'CONNOR, KEVIN) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#61

(#61) ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 7/26/2018 IS RESCHEDULED TO 8/28/2018, AT 4:00 PM, IN ROOM 13614, BEFORE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/19/2018. 7/20/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

#60

(#60) Letter to Judge Slomsky dated July 19, 2018 by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. re #59 Notice (Other) (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) Modified on 7/23/2018 (tjd). (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#59

(#59) Letter by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF (O'CONNOR, KEVIN) Modified on 7/19/2018 (fb). (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#58

(#58) ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ADMIT JOSEPH M. VENTO, ESQ. PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. MR. VENTO IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/17/18.7/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#57

(#57) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Joseph M. Vento ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12923466.) filed by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'CONNOR, KEVIN) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Daryl Trout by certified mail on July 17, 2017 (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/21/2017)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon 10 defendants by certified mail on July 3 and July 5, 2017 (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons with Complaint upon 60 by certified mail on 6/29/17, 6/30/17, 7/1/17 (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

#3

(#3) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/19/2017. 6/20/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC..(rt) (Entered: 06/16/2017)

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, DAYLENE BAKER, MOUSSA BARO, DIANE BATES, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LORI CAHILL, AUDREY CARLSON, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NANCY COOVER, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DEBBIE CROOM, ALEX CRUZ, NOLBERTO DABRIEL, CHRISTIAN DOLE, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SAMANTHA FULLER, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELA GIL, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRESCIOUS JEFFREY, DEIRDRE JELKS, CHER JURACEK, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, YOLANDA OCHOA, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELICA ORELLANA, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LYNELL SCHOMAKER, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DARYL TROUT, SHARECA TYSON, PATTI URBANEK, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, BRANTON WALKER, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, JASMINE WENGLER, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 161183.), filed by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(rt) (Entered: 06/16/2017)

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) SCHEDULING ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 7/18/2019 AT 02:30 PM IN JUDGES CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/6/2019 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/28/2019. DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 5/23/2019. MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 7/5/2019. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 5/23/2019. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/20/2019. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/20/2019. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 7/25/2019 AT 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 13A BEFORE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/29/2018. 8/29/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) ORDER THAT THE #62 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF SHANNON D. AZZARO IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/10/2018.8/14/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APP FORWARDED.(kp, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Shannon D. Azzaro, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12978946.) filed by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'CONNOR, KEVIN) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 7/26/2018 IS RESCHEDULED TO 8/28/2018, AT 4:00 PM, IN ROOM 13614, BEFORE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/19/2018. 7/20/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) Letter to Judge Slomsky dated July 19, 2018 by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. re #59 Notice (Other) (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) Modified on 7/23/2018 (tjd). (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) Letter by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF (O'CONNOR, KEVIN) Modified on 7/19/2018 (fb). (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ADMIT JOSEPH M. VENTO, ESQ. PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. MR. VENTO IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/17/18.7/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Joseph M. Vento ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12923466.) filed by ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'CONNOR, KEVIN) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN J. O'CONNOR on behalf of ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF (O'CONNOR, KEVIN) (Entered: 07/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 7/26/18 AT 4:00 PM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/2/18. 7/3/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DEFENDANT LYNELL SCHOMAKER'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by LYNELL SCHOMAKER.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Supplement)(kp, ) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Memorandum by NANCY COOVER. (kp, ) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Daryl Trout by certified mail on July 17, 2017 (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon 10 defendants by certified mail on July 3 and July 5, 2017 (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons with Complaint upon 60 by certified mail on 6/29/17, 6/30/17, 7/1/17 (WOLFSON, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/19/2017. 6/20/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC..(rt) (Entered: 06/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (rt) (Entered: 06/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Summons Issued as to ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, DAYLENE BAKER, MOUSSA BARO, DIANE BATES, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LORI CAHILL, AUDREY CARLSON, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NANCY COOVER, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DEBBIE CROOM, ALEX CRUZ, NOLBERTO DABRIEL, CHRISTIAN DOLE, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SAMANTHA FULLER, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELA GIL, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRESCIOUS JEFFREY, DEIRDRE JELKS, CHER JURACEK, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, YOLANDA OCHOA, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELICA ORELLANA, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LYNELL SCHOMAKER, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DARYL TROUT, SHARECA TYSON, PATTI URBANEK, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, BRANTON WALKER, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, JASMINE WENGLER, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF. Ninety-Nine Forwarded To: Counsel on June 16, 2017 (rt) (Entered: 06/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ARLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ARMOUR CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ATLANTIC CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, DAYLENE BAKER, MOUSSA BARO, DIANE BATES, BATESVILLE HOLDINGS LLC, BEDFORD GARDENS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, BELLA VISTA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BLACK HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, BROADWAY HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC, BROKEN BOW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LORI CAHILL, AUDREY CARLSON, CHASE COUNTY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, CLARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLARKSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, CLEAR WATER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, COLUMBUS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NANCY COOVER, COVINGTON HEIGHTS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, COZAD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DEBBIE CROOM, ALEX CRUZ, NOLBERTO DABRIEL, CHRISTIAN DOLE, DOWNS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EDWARDSVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, EL DORADO KS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, ESKRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, FRANKLIN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SAMANTHA FULLER, FULLERTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELA GIL, GRAND ISLAND LAKEVIEW CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GRAND ISLAND PARK PLACE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, GROTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, HALLMARK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, HARTINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CNETER, LLC, HERITAGE OF HOT SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK RILEY HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK SOUTH CUMBERLANDS HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF LITTLE ROCK WEST MARKHAM HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF MOUNTAIN VIEW SNF HOLDINGS, LLC, HIGHLANDS OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK JOHN ASHLEY HOLDINGS LLC, IPSWICH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRESCIOUS JEFFREY, DEIRDRE JELKS, CHER JURACEK, KAW RIVER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAKE NORDEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LANSING CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, LAUREL POINT CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER LLC, MADISON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MEADOWBROOK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MILBANK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, MINE CREEK HOLDINGS LLC, MOBRIDGE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEBRASKA CITY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NELIGH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, NEODESHA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, NORFOLK CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, O'NEILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, YOLANDA OCHOA, OMAHA METRO CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, ANGELICA ORELLANA, PARKWAY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PIERRE CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PITTSBURG CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, PLATTSMOUTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, PRAIRIE HILLS CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, REDFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SALEM CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, LYNELL SCHOMAKER, SCHUYLER CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH SCHWARTZ, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL SCHWARTZ, SCOTTSBLUFF CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SEARCY HOLDINGS LLC, SIDNEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SKYLINE SERVICES GROUP, LLC, SORENSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, SPRING HILL CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, TEKAMAH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DARYL TROUT, SHARECA TYSON, PATTI URBANEK, VALHAVEN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAKEFIELD CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, BRANTON WALKER, WATERTOWN CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WAUSA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, WELLINGTON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, JASMINE WENGLER, WEST JACKSONVILLE CARE AND REHABILITATION LLC, WICHITA CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF, WILSON CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER SNF ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 161183.), filed by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(rt) (Entered: 06/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less