This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 20:09:59 (UTC).

Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. v. Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2017 Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Claria Horn Boom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claria Horn Boom

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.

Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. as successor-in-interest to the Appliances business unit of the General Electric Company doing business as GE Appliances

Defendant

Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth B. Alphin

Attorney at Fultz Maddox Dickens PLC

101 S. Fifth Street, 27Th Floor

Louisville, KY 40202-3116

Phillip A. Martin

Attorney at Fultz Maddox Dickens PLC

101 S. Fifth Street, 27Th Floor

Louisville, KY 40202-3116

Defendant Attorneys

William G. Carpenter

Attorney at Briol & Benson, PLLC

80 S. Eighth Street, Suite 3700

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Christopher E. Schaefer

Attorney at Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC - Louisville

500 W. Jefferson Street, Suite 2000

Louisville, KY 40202

Mark Briol

Attorney at Briol & Benson, PLLC

80 S. Eighth Street, Suite 3700

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) Joint STATUS REPORT by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Alphin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER REQUESTING STATUS REPORT by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/3/2019. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this Order. cc:counsel (MEJ) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#18

(#18) MEMORANDUM AND OPINION & ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/12/2017; re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc., #8 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc. ---For the foregoing reasons, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: ARCAs Motion to Dismiss,[R. 7], is DENIED WITH LEAVE TO REFILE and ARCAs Motion to Stay Litigation, [R.8], is GRANTED. The parties shall notify the Court by filinga status report in the record and also by emailing the Court atKelly_P_Harris@kywd.uscourts.gov when the arbitration proceeding is complete.cc:counsel (ARM) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

#17

(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc.. (Schaefer, Christopher) (Entered: 07/05/2017)

#16

(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc.. (Schaefer, Christopher) (Entered: 07/05/2017)

15 #1

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit

#15

(#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit) (Alphin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

14 #1

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit

#14

(#14) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay filed by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit) (Alphin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

#7

(#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit) (Alphin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

#6

(#6) SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc. COMPLETED on 5/10/2017. (ARM) (Entered: 05/18/2017)

#5

(#5) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (KJA) (Entered: 04/19/2017)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) (Entered: 04/18/2017)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. Magistrate Judge designation: Colin H. Lindsay. (DJT) (Entered: 04/18/2017)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2422175., filed by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (DJT) (Entered: 04/18/2017)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint STATUS REPORT by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Alphin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER REQUESTING STATUS REPORT by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/3/2019. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this Order. cc:counsel (MEJ) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • (#19) TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr., Pursuant to GO 2018-03, Case reassigned to Judge Claria H. Boom for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell no longer assigned to case. cc:counsel (MLG) (Entered: 04/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Case Stayed per Opinion on 12/12/17. (ARM) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MEMORANDUM AND OPINION & ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/12/2017; re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc., #8 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc. ---For the foregoing reasons, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: ARCAs Motion to Dismiss,[R. 7], is DENIED WITH LEAVE TO REFILE and ARCAs Motion to Stay Litigation, [R.8], is GRANTED. The parties shall notify the Court by filinga status report in the record and also by emailing the Court atKelly_P_Harris@kywd.uscourts.gov when the arbitration proceeding is complete.cc:counsel (ARM) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc.. (Schaefer, Christopher) (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc.. (Schaefer, Christopher) (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit) (Alphin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay filed by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit) (Alphin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 6/5/2017 granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice William G. Carpenter. cc: Counsel(KJA) (Entered: 06/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Mark Briol to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2447926.by Defendant Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Schaefer, Christopher) (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc. for Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc.. by Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc.. (Schaefer, Christopher) (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Stay Litigation Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. Section 3 by Defendant Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Isaac Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 2009 Agreement, #4 Exhibit Forbearance Agreement, #5 Exhibit 6th Addendum to Agmt, #6 Exhibit June 2016 Agreement, #7 Exhibit 2016 ARCA Demand for Arbitration, #8 Exhibit Excerpt to JV Agreement, #9 Affidavit Carpenter Affidavitg, #10 Exhibit GEA Notice of Defense and Counterclaim, #11 Exhibit Amended Response, #12 Proposed Order) (Schaefer, Christopher) Modified on 6/1/2017 to edit docket text (MNM). (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit - The 2009 Agreement, #4 Exhibit - The Forbearance Agreement, #5 Exhibit - The 6th Addendum to the Agreement, #6 Exhibit - The 2016 Agreement, #7 Exhibit - The 2016 Demand for Arbitration, #8 Exhibit - The JV Agreement, #9 Proposed Order) (Schaefer, Christopher) Modified on 6/1/2017 to add attachment descriptions (MNM). (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc. COMPLETED on 5/10/2017. (ARM) (Entered: 05/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (KJA) (Entered: 04/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • (#4) TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 4/19/2017; IT IS ORDERED that Judge David J. Hale RECUSES from this matter and the action is REASSIGNED to the docket of Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the civil action number to reflect the initials TBR on all future pleadings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel, CM-Judge Russell (NWT) (Entered: 04/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) (Entered: 04/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. Magistrate Judge designation: Colin H. Lindsay. (DJT) (Entered: 04/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Appliance Recycling Centers of America, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2422175., filed by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (DJT) (Entered: 04/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APPLIANCE RECYCLING CENTERS OF AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HAIER US APPLIANCESOLUTIONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark J Briol

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher E. Schaefer