This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 20:17:04 (UTC).

Ferguson v. Pick Five Imports, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 Ferguson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Pick Five Imports, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-00498

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cindy A. Ferguson

Austin, TX 78723

Defendants

IAC/Interactive Corp.

Home Shopping Network

Fagor America

Pick Five Imports, Inc. doing business as Maxi-Matic USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Lewis C. Miltenberger

Attorney at Miltenberger Law Firm, PLLC

1190 N Carroll Avenue

Southlake, TX 76092

Michael B. Buckley

Attorney at Buckley Law Group, PA

3637 Fourth Street North, Suite 330

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Aric L. Stock

Attorney at Stromberg Stock, PLLC

8750 N Central Expy, Ste 625

Dallas, TX 75231

Peter Thompson

Attorney at Thompson & Reilley, P.C.

1021 Main Street - Suite 1950

Houston, TX 77002

Steven Scott Reilley

Attorney at Thompson & Reilley

1021 Main Street, Suite 1950

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

22 #1

Proposed Order Order Granting Pick Five Imports d/b/a Maxi-Matic USA, Inc.'

#22

#21

#20

19 #2

Proposed Order

19 #1

Affidavit

#19

5 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#5

#4

3 #1

Summons

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Letter & Receipt

#1

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) (Entered: 03/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING #8 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING #9 Motion for Default Judgment; DENYING #19 Motion to Amend/Correct; GRANTING #22 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) (Entered: 03/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Dismiss by Pick Five Imports, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Pick Five Imports d/b/a Maxi-Matic USA, Inc.'s Mtn to Dismiss)(Stock, Aric) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Pick Five Imports d/b/a Maxi-Matic USA, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Aric L. Stock added to party Pick Five Imports, Inc.(pty:dft) by Pick Five Imports, Inc..(Stock, Aric) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Fagor America, re #9 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Cindy A. Ferguson corrected (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Order)(Reilley, Steven) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Amend/Correct Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading by Fagor America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Reilley, Steven) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Steven Scott Reilley: re #17 Response to Motion. (td) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ***DEFICIENT PLEADING - multiple pleadings*** RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Fagor America, re #9 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Cindy A. Ferguson & Motion to Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Reilley, Steven) Modified on 1/19/2018 (td). (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aric L. Stock on behalf of IAC/Interactive Corp.. Attorney Aric L. Stock added to party IAC/Interactive Corp.(pty:dft) (Stock, Aric) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael B. Buckley. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant Fagor America, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Fagor America.(Reilley, Steven) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Default Judgment by Cindy A. Ferguson. (dm) (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by Fagor America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Reilley, Steven) (Entered: 12/07/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Service by Cindy A. Ferguson. (td) (Entered: 12/06/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Service by Cindy A. Ferguson. (td) (Entered: 12/06/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by IAC/Interactive Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Miltenberger, Lewis) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Fagor America, IAC/Interactive Corp., and Pick Five Imports, Inc. (jf) (Entered: 07/07/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter from Cindy A. Ferguson requesting issuance of summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jf) (Entered: 07/07/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter/Correspondence to Cindy A. Ferguson re: case assignment. (td) (Entered: 05/25/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 100030351), filed by Cindy A. Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Letter & Receipt)(td) (Entered: 05/25/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less