This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2021 at 16:22:20 (UTC).

CARMICHAEL v. CARMICHAEL et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2017 CARMICHAEL filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CARMICHAEL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-60000

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENOCH CARMICHAEL

Defendants

PHYLLIS CARMICHAEL

OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP.

PITTSBURGH CORNING CORP

EAGLE PICHER INDUSTRIES, INC.

SOUTHERN TEXTILE CORP

H.K. PORTER CO., INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC

OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY

KEENE CORPORATION

ARMSTRONG WORLD INDUSTRIES

GAF CORP

GARLOCK, INC.

SOUTHERN ASBESTOS CO., THE

TURNER & NEWALL, LTD.

CUMMINGS INSULATION CO., INC.

CLAREMONT COMPANY, INC.

COMBUSTION ENGINEERING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

EDWIN L. WALLACE

Attorney at THORNTON & NAUMES, LLP

100 Summer St., 30Th Fl.

Boston, MA 02110

MICHAEL B. LATTI

Attorney at LATTI ASSOCIATES

30-31 Union Wharf

Boston, MA 02109

GARRETT J. BRADLEY

Attorney at THORNTON LAW FIRM LLP

1 Lincoln Street, 25Th Floor

Boston, MA 02111

WARREN D. HUTCHISON

Attorney at DONOVAN HATEM LLP

Two Seaport Lane

Boston, MA 02210

LAWRENCE G. CETRULO

Attorney at CETRULO & CAPONE

Two Seaport Lane, 10Th Fl, Exchange Place

Boston, MA 02110

JAMES H. ANDERSON

300 Tower Hill Rd

Osterville, MA 02655

PAUL KILLEEN

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP

10 St. James Ave

Boston, MA 02116

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CORRECT A CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a) (DOC. NO. #5 ) IS GRANTED. ANY VIABLE NON-BANKRUPT DEFENDANTS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; THE CASES ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE "BANKRUPTCY-ONLY" DOCKET; AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THESE CASES CLOSED FOR ADMINISTRATIVE PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/12/2017. 6/12/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (aeg) (Entered: 06/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIVL. P. 60(a), with Proposed Order, Memorandum in Support, Certificate of Service and Exhibits. (aeg) (Entered: 06/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKET ENTRIES FILED IN ORIGINATING DISTRICT MASSACHUSETTS(jwl, ) (Entered: 06/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL by ENOCH CARMICHAEL (jwl, ) (Entered: 06/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONSTO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES,DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTEDAS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/2/17. 6/5/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED(jwl, ) (Entered: 06/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER NO. 1250 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDEREDTO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASESFROM THE U.S.D.C. DISTRICT OF MASSACHUSETTS, IN ACCORDANCEWITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/2/17. 6/5/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, ) (Entered: 06/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TURNER & NEWALL, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where H.K. PORTER CO., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN TEXTILE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CLAREMONT is a litigant