This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/18/2019 at 15:06:47 (UTC).

BOKF, NA v. Estes et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 BOKF, NA filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Estes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William G. Cobb and Larry R. Hicks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-00694

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Referral Judge

William G. Cobb

Presiding Judge

Larry R. Hicks

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

BOKF, NA

Counter Claimants and Defendants

Becky Lynn Carpenter

Karen Niles

Robert Estes

Shirley Carvey

James Carpenter

Jerry Carpenter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jared Michael Burden

Attorney at Frederic Dorwart Lawyers, PLLC

124 E Fourth St

Tulsa, OK 74103

Spencer H. Gunnerson

Attorney at Kemp, Jones & Coulthard, LLP

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Madison Levine

Attorney at Kemp, Jones & Coulthard, LLP

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, #1700

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Frederic Griffin Dorwart

Attorney at Frederic Dorwart, Lawyers PLLC

124 E Fourth St

Tulsa, OK 74103

Paul DeMuro

Attorney at Frederic Dorwart Lawyers, PLLC

124 E Fourth St

Tulsa, OK 74103

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorney

Thomas C. Bradley

448 Hill St

Reno, NV 89501

 

Court Documents

#58

#57

#56

#55

#54

#53

#52

#51

#50

#30

#24

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to ECF No. #50 Notice of Appeal : Appellant's motion for injunctive relief is granted. The court sua sponte expedites the hearing of this appeal. Briefing is completed. This case shall be placed on the next available oral argument calendar. The motion of American Bankers Association for leave to file an amicus curiae brief is referred to the panel assigned to hear the merits of this appeal. USCA Case 18-15369. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 05/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER that plaintiff's motion to dismiss counterclaims (ECF No. #30 ) is GRANTED; Defendants counterclaims (ECF No. #24 ) are DISMISSED in their entirety. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) (Entered: 04/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER that plaintiff's motion for an injunction pending appeal (ECF No. #54 ) and motion to shorten briefing schedule (ECF No. #55 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MOTION to Shorten Time re #54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff BOKF, NA. (Gunnerson, Spencer) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff BOKF, NA. Responses due by 3/26/2018. (Gunnerson, Spencer) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Plaintiff BOKF, NA re #50 Notice of Appeal. Transcripts are NOT required for this appeal. (Gunnerson, Spencer) (Entered: 03/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) USCA, Ninth Circuit Civil Docketing Letter re ECF No. #50 Notice of Appeal. Briefing schedule will be set by future court order. USCA Case number 18-15369 assigned. (LH) (Entered: 03/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) FORMS - Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for ECF No. #50 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (Attachments: #1 Transcript Order Form) (LH) (Entered: 03/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff BOKF, NA. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0978-4993764. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Gunnerson, Spencer) (Entered: 03/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Docket(#49) ERROR: Notice entered in error as attorney does n ot represent any parties in this case. CORRECTION:: Document 49 terminated as filed in erorr. NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1 re: James M. Burden is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. (no image attached) (DRM) Modified on 3/2/2018 (RFJ). (Entered: 03/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jared M. Burden and approving Designation of Local Counsel Spencer H. Gunnerson for BOKF, NA. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 11/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Frederic Dorwart and approving Designation of Local Counsel Spencer Gunnerson for BOKF, NA. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/17/2017. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 11/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Frederic Dorwart and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Spencer H. Gunnerson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4860544) by Plaintiff BOKF, NA. (Gunnerson, Spencer) (Entered: 11/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jared M. Burden and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Spencer H. Gunnerson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4860267) by Plaintiff BOKF, NA. (Gunnerson, Spencer) (Entered: 11/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/15/2017. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) (Entered: 11/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by BOKF, NA that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent BOKF Financial Corporation for BOKF, NA added. (Gunnerson, Spencer) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Docket(#3) FIRST NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 2-1 (a)(d): that Madison Levine is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1 (a)(d). You are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Attorney advised to visit the Courts website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select ATTORNEY REGISTRATION located in the middle of the web page to register. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel James M. Burden to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 12/29/2017. (no image attached) (MR) Modified on 3/6/2018 CORRECT NAME OF ATTORNEY JARED M. BURDEN. (WJ). (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MR) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4854039) by BOKF, NA. Proof of service due by 2/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gunnerson, Spencer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAMES CARPENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spencer H. Gunnerson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jared Michael Burden