This case was last updated from PACER on 07/26/2020 at 09:19:36 (UTC).

Benchmark Electronics, Inc. et al v. Panasonic Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2017 Benchmark Electronics, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Panasonic Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:17-CV-01219

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Benchmark Electronics Huntsville, Inc.

Benchmark Electronics Tijuana, S. de R.L. de C.V.

Benchmark Electronics, Inc.

Benchmark Electronics Phoenix, Inc.

Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark), Inc.

Defendants

Nichicon Corporation

Shizuki Electric Co., Ltd.

Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd.

Soshin Electronics of America Inc.

Matsuo Electric Co., Ltd.

Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd.

NEC TOKIN America, Inc.

ELNA America Inc.

ROHM Co., Ltd.

Fujitsu Ltd.

TOSHIN KOGYO Co., Ltd.

SANYO Electric Co., Ltd.

Taitsu America, Inc.

Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd.

Nichicon (America) Corporation

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lori P Lustrin

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33131-3456

Lee L Kaplan

Attorney at Smyser Kaplan & Veselka

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77002-2761

Scott N Wagner

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg et al

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131-3456

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Gilman

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

1000 Main Street, Ste 2550

Houston, TX 77002

Michael E. Martinez

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 W Madison St, Ste 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Claire M. Maddox

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1900 K St, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Heather Tewksbury

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler et al

950 Page Mill Rd

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Michael F. Tubach

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, 28Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3823

Walter Moreau Berger

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

800 Capitol St., Suite 2400

Houston, TX 77002

Jeffrey L Kessler

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Ian L. Papendick

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

101 California St

San Francisco, CA 94111

Molly M. Donovan

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP

200 Park Ave

New York, NY 10166

Mollie Caryn Richardson

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Ave

New York, NY 10166

Jeffrey C. Bank

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini et al

1301 Ave Of The Americas, 40Th Fl

New York, NY 10019

Other Attorneys

Eric R. Sega

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1047

Joseph J. Bial

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1047

Bruce E. Sokler

Attorney at Mintz Levin et al

701 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20004-2633

Robert Gil Kidwell

Attorney at Mintz Levin et al

701 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20004

Mark S Finkelstein

Attorney at Shannon Martin Finkelstein, Alvarado & Dunne, PC

1001 Mckinney St, Ste 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Darrell Prescott

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP

452 Fifth Ave

New York, NY 10018

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#66

#65

#64

#63

#62

61 #1

Proposed Order

#61

#60

#59

#58

54 #1

Proposed Order

#54

#53

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) ORDER OF DISMISSAL on #65 Notice of Dismissal. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Case terminated on 6/23/2017. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Defendants by Benchmark Electronics de Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville, Inc., Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Benchmark Electronics Tijuana, S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark), Inc., Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions, Inc., Benchmark Electronics Phoenix, Inc., filed. (Kaplan, Lee) (Entered: 06/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AVX Corporation, filed.(Finkelstein, Mark) (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ORDER granting #61 Motion for Designation as Attorney In Charge by Jeffrey L. Kessler (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, filed.(Duke, Brandon) (Entered: 06/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) DESIGNATION of Jeffrey L. Kessler as attorney in charge of Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duke, Brandon) (Entered: 06/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION. Initial Conference set for 8/4/2017 at 2:00 PM is cancelled, filed. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER granting #54 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer and Other Deadlines (Motion to Transfer due by 6/27/2017.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ORDER granting #53 Motion for Mollie C. Richardson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER granting #52 Motion for Ian L. Papendick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 06/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Lori P. Lustrin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benchmark Electronics Huntsville, Inc., Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark), Inc., Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions, Inc., Benchmark Electronics Phoenix, Inc., Benchmark Electronics Tijuana, S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics de Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/10/2017. (Kaplan, Lee) (Entered: 04/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Benchmark Electronics, Inc., filed.(Kaplan, Lee) (Entered: 04/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Benchmark Electronics Huntsville, Inc. identifying Benchmark Electronics, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Kaplan, Lee) (Entered: 04/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions, Inc. identifying Benchmark Electronics, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Kaplan, Lee) (Entered: 04/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Benchmark Electronics de Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V. identifying AVEX Liberty, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Kaplan, Lee) (Entered: 04/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark), Inc. identifying Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Kaplan, Lee) (Entered: 04/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Benchmark Electronics Phoenix, Inc. identifying Benchmark Electronics, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Kaplan, Lee) (Entered: 04/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Benchmark Electronics Tijuana, S. de R.L. de C.V. identifying EFTC Operating Corp. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Kaplan, Lee) (Entered: 04/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/4/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 04/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-18236968) filed by Benchmark Electronics de Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville, Inc., Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Benchmark Electronics Tijuana, S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark), Inc., Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions, Inc., Benchmark Electronics Phoenix, Inc..(Kaplan, Lee) (Entered: 04/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fujitsu Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Benchmark Electronics, Inc. is a litigant