This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2021 at 16:22:20 (UTC).

ANDREWS et al v. OWENS ILLINOIS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 ANDREWS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against OWENS ILLINOIS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-60009

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RALPH J. ANDREWS

MARION ANDREWS

Defendants

OWENS ILLINOIS, INC.

PITTSBURGH CORNING CORP.

EATLE PICHER INDUSTRIES, INC.

SOUTHERN TEXTILE CORP

H.K. PORTER CO., INC.

RAYMARK INDUSTRIES, INC.

RAYBESTOS-MANHATTAN, INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY

CELOTEX CORPORATION

KEENE CORPORATION

GAF CORP

CAREY CANADA, INC.

ARMSTRONG WORLD INDUSTRIES

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' PETITION TO CORRECT A CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a) IS GRANTED AND THAT, AS TO THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST, 1. ANY VIABLE NON-BANKRUPT DEFENDANTS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 2. THE CASES ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE "BANKRUPTCY-ONLY" DOCKET; AND 3. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THESE CASES AS CLOSED FOR ADMINISTRATIVE PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/9/2017. 8/10/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (SEE DOC. NO. 9013 IN 01-MD-875) (aeg) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Entries filed in USDC, District of Massachusetts. (rt) (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL(rt) (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES,DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/10/2017. 7/21/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER NO. 1251 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASESFROM THE USDC DISTRICT OF MASSACHUSETTS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/10/2017. 7/21/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less