2:17-CV-60009
07/10/2017
Disposed - Other Disposed
Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability
EDUARDO C. ROBRENO
RALPH J. ANDREWS
MARION ANDREWS
OWENS ILLINOIS, INC.
PITTSBURGH CORNING CORP.
EATLE PICHER INDUSTRIES, INC.
SOUTHERN TEXTILE CORP
H.K. PORTER CO., INC.
RAYMARK INDUSTRIES, INC.
RAYBESTOS-MANHATTAN, INC.
OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY
CELOTEX CORPORATION
KEENE CORPORATION
GAF CORP
CAREY CANADA, INC.
ARMSTRONG WORLD INDUSTRIES
Docket(#5) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' PETITION TO CORRECT A CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a) IS GRANTED AND THAT, AS TO THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST, 1. ANY VIABLE NON-BANKRUPT DEFENDANTS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 2. THE CASES ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE "BANKRUPTCY-ONLY" DOCKET; AND 3. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THESE CASES AS CLOSED FOR ADMINISTRATIVE PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/9/2017. 8/10/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (SEE DOC. NO. 9013 IN 01-MD-875) (aeg) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Docket Entries filed in USDC, District of Massachusetts. (rt) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL(rt) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES,DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/10/2017. 7/21/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER NO. 1251 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASESFROM THE USDC DISTRICT OF MASSACHUSETTS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/10/2017. 7/21/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
[-] Read Less